skip to content

Adams Goldraich, Livia

CPSO#: 96372

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 21 Jan 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 25 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2021