skip to content

Adamiak, Anna

CPSO#: 89891

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anna Adamiak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adamiak ( CPSO# 89891 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
CC Wing
4th Floor, Room W4110
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:01 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA ADAMIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
EL - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2010