skip to content

Adam, Paul

CPSO#: 25986

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Mar 2020
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 411
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 922-3417
Fax: (416) 961-0383 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1371 Neilson Road
Suite 310
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-1413
Fax: (416) 281-6242
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective:28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 03 Mar 2020 Active
             As from March 3, 2020, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Adam in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Adam to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                             DR. PAUL ADAM
                                             ("Dr. Adam")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Adam, certificate of registration number 25986, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that the College conducted three (3)
                  investigations bearing File Numbers 1100274, 1100968, 1103660 (the
                  "Investigations") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct
                  and/or am incompetent in my dermatology practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for three (3)
                        months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every week for a full day;
                        (iv)  At each visit, directly observe all of my patients encounters
                              for the day of the visit, and review the patient charts for
                              each such patient; 
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              week or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (5)(f) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program ("PROBE Program"), by
                              receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any
                              condition or qualification; and
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Adam, will agree to abide by any recommendations of the
                        PROBE program.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake to complete this requirement within six (6)
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of
                        the Professional Education set out in section (6) above, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or
                        "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  (c)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  (d)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Adam, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Adam, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Three College investigations were conducted into whether Dr.
                              Adam engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent
                              in his dermatology practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Adam will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Adam will engage in professional education in
                              professional boundaries and communication.
                  
                              Dr. Adam's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College approximately 3 months following the
                              end of the period of Clinical Supervision and professional
                              education.
                  
            (c)   I, Dr. Adam, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until
                  the College determines its terms are satisfied.

            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Adam, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Adam, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Adam, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: March 3, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Adam to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 3, 2020:

Three College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Adam engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his dermatology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Adam will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Adam will engage in professional education in professional boundaries and communication.

Dr. Adam’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 3 months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and professional education.