skip to content

Acosta Velez, Juan Gabriel

CPSO#: 107259

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2024
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidad Del Norte, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University.
HGH - McMaster wing office 526
237 Barton St E.
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46898
Fax: 9055752634 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Juan Gabriel Acosta Velez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Acosta Velez ( CPSO# 107259)

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Aveue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jul 2015
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 18 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2021 Active
 1.    Dr. Juan Gabriel Acosta Velez may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Cardiology,  McMaster University, in which Dr. Acosta
                        Velez  holds  an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of  Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Acosta Velez no longer holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Acosta  Velez's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a decision about  Dr.  Acosta  Velez's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2018, and expires on June 30, 2024.
                  Upon  renewal  of  Dr.  Acosta  Velez's  academic appointment at McMaster
                  University, the expiry date can be extended,  subject  to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.