skip to content

Acedillo, Rey Roman

CPSO#: 91232

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1265 Arthur St E
Suite 308
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone: 807-684-9288
Fax: 807-622-5710 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rey Acedillo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Acedillo ( CPSO# 91232 )

Business Address:
1265 Arthur St E
Suite 308
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone Number: 807-684-9288

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REY ROMAN ACEDILLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACEDILLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 05 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Sep 2016 to 05 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013