skip to content

Abuzeid, Wael

CPSO#: 88588

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiovascular lab, Kidd 3
Kingston Health Sciences Center
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1383
Fax: 613-548-2400 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Wael Abuzeid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abuzeid ( CPSO# 88588 )

Business Address:
22 - 16700 Bayview Ave.
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (289) 803-2959

Business Address:
30 Bond St.
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
2 - 9625 Yonge St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 237-6640

Business Address:
6 - 906 Sheppard Avenue West
North York ON  M3H 2T5
Phone Number: (416) 633-0045

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Faculty of Medicine
Room 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7

Business Address:
A208 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WAEL ABUZEID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUZEID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012