skip to content

Abunassar, Ramzi Yussif

CPSO#: 26600

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hebrew

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ramzi Y. Abunassar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Tel: 1-888-781-8083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018