skip to content

Abuguyan, Fahad Ibrahim M

CPSO#: 94969

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 23 Jun 2011
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017