skip to content

Abu-Rashed, Kamal Ahmad

CPSO#: 97221

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:St.Christopher Iba Mar Diop Col of Med, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Erie Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3W9
Phone: (519) 254-2999
Fax: (519) 254-4999 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot St W
Department of Internal Medicine
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot St W
Department of Internal Medicine
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Abu-Rashed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abu-Rashed ( CPSO# 97221 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
130 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 250-4449

Business Address:
250 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 110
Windsor ON  N8X 2R3
Phone Number: (519) 971-2901

Business Address:
101 Erie Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3W9
Phone Number: (519) 254-2999

Business Address:
207 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-0077


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:20 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2021 Active
 Dr.  Kamal Ahmad Abu-Rashed may practice medicine independently in internal medicine.