skip to content

Abu-Bakare, Asiru

CPSO#: 24311

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 May 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 May 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Health Centre Inc.
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Fax: (807) 346-6206 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

THUNDER BAY REGIONAL HEALTH SCIENCE
980 OLIVER ROAD
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 6846000
Fax: (807) 6847466
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

ST JOSEPH HOSPITAL SITE
35, ALGOMA STREET N
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G6
Canada
Phone: (807) 343-2431
Fax: (807) 343-0144
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Asiru Abu-Bakare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abu-Bakare ( CPSO# 24311 )

Business Address:
Port Arthur Health Centre Inc
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASIRU ABU-BAKARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU-BAKARE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1990