skip to content

Abu-Abed, Mohamed Ismail

CPSO#: 90566

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6563 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

525 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6X 3C8
Canada
Phone: (905) 453-4140
Fax: (905) 861-9140
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1001 Peter Robertson Blvd
Brampton ON  L6R 2Y3
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-2449
Fax: (905) 792-0346
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abu-Abed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abu-Abed ( CPSO# 90566 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
525 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6X 3C8
Phone Number: (905) 453-4140

Business Address:
1001 Peter Robertson Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6R 2Y3

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ISMAIL ABU-ABED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU-ABED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011