skip to content

Abu Shama, Raed Abdel Rahim Hassan

CPSO#: 96304

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Apr 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2024
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Tichreen, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7258 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

865 Regent St
Suit 325
Sudbury ON  P3E 2Y9
Canada
Phone: 705-523-7258
Fax: (705) 523-7268
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Abu Shama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abu Shama ( CPSO# 96304 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
865 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:27 Apr 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective:27 Apr 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2018 Active
 1.    Dr. Raed Abdel Rahim Hassan Abu Shama may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal
                        Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of
                        Medicine,  in  which Dr. Abu Shama holds an academic appointment at
                        the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Abu Shama no longer holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that Dr. Abu Shama's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes   a  decision  about  Dr.  Abu  Shama's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on April 27, 2018, and expires on June 30,
                  2024.   Upon  renewal  of Dr. Abu Shama's  academic  appointment  at  the
                  Northern Ontario School  of  Medicine,  the  expiry date can be extended,
                  subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.