skip to content

Abtahi, Maryam

CPSO#: 98739

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 2148 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone: 613-596-0300 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maryam Abtahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abtahi ( CPSO# 98739 )

Business Address:
Icare Surgical and Optical Centre
205-2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone Number: (613) 596-0300

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARYAM ABTAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABTAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2018