skip to content

Abrams, Mitchell Weldon

CPSO#: 87300

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 401
915 King St West
Toronto ON  M6K 3M2
Phone: (226) 339-9309 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Coronation St
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: (519) 740-4904
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Abrams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abrams ( CPSO# 87300 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
700 Coronation Street
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (513) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:26 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MITCHELL WELDON ABRAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)