skip to content

Abrahim, Mohammed

CPSO#: 89838

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Abdolhady, Mohammad Ebrahim (used until: 30 Jan 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 876-7606
Fax: (905) 876-7000 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Abrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 1 2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ABRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2008