skip to content

Abrahim, Ken Shafquat Intikhab

CPSO#: 92604

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Our Lady of Fatima University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
8123 Lundy's Lane
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 1H3
Phone: (289) 296-4712
Fax: 2894260198 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ken Abrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Abrahim ( CPSO# 92604 )

Business Address:
8 - 8123 Lundy's Lane
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 1H3
Phone Number: (289) 296-4712


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEN SHAFQUAT INTIKHAB ABRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 07 Dec 2021
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 07 Feb 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 06 Dec 2021
Summary:

On May 20, 2021 allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Abrahim were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College, now referred to as the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.

The Notice of Hearing alleged Dr. Abrahim had engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario found he committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of professional misconduct under section 51 of the Health Professions Procedural Code or an act of professional misconduct as defined in the regulations.

The OPSDT heard the matter on December 6, 2021 by videoconference. Counsel for both the College and Dr. Abrahim attended the hearing.

On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability) and an Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty, and after hearing submissions of both counsel, the OPSDT found Dr. Abrahim committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario found he committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of professional misconduct under section 51 of the Health Professions Procedural Code or an act of professional misconduct as defined in the regulations.

Disposition

On December 6, 2021, the OPSDT issued its Order directing that:
• Dr. Abrahim attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
• The Registrar suspend Dr. Abrahim’s certificate of registration for two months commencing December 7, 2021;
• The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Abrahim ’s certificate of registration, as set out in the Order;
• Dr. Abrahim pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 by January 6, 2022.

Dr. Abrahim waived his right to appeal the Tribunal’s decision and the panel delivered the reprimand at the conclusion of the hearing.

Release of reasons

The OPSDT released its reasons for its decision on January 7, 2022. A link to the reasons is below


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2021-12-06

Concerns

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: December 03, 2018
Summary: Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information: _ _ On December 3, 2018, the New York State Board for Professional Medical Conduct accepted Dr. Ken Abrahim’s surrender of his physician license in the State of New York in lieu of pursuing allegations of professional misconduct against him. The Board also ordered that Dr. Abrahim’s name be stricken from the roster of physicians in the State of New York. The allegations of professional misconduct arise from the disciplinary action taken against Dr. Abrahim by the Florida Board of Medicine and from Dr. Abrahim’s failure to disclose the existence of the Florida Board complaint on his New York State licenser registration renewal form. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on December 5, 2018.

 

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: July 25, 2018
Summary: Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information: _ _ On July 25, 2018, Dr. Ken Abrahim entered into a Consent Agreement with the North Carolina Medical Board (the “Board”) whereby the Board ordered a reprimand against Dr. Abrahim’s licence to practise medicine in North Carolina and a fine of $5000.00. Dr. Abrahim voluntarily entered into the Consent Agreement to resolve proceedings by the Board arising from Dr. Abrahim’s failure to disclose in his June 2017 annual Board registration that the Florida Board of Medicine had issued an administrative complaint against him in February 2017.

 

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: March 13, 2018
Summary: Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information: _ _ On March 13, 2018, the Florida Board of Medicine approved and adopted a Settlement Agreement between Dr. Abrahim and the Florida Department of Health as an Order of the Board. The allegations against Dr. Abrahim included several counts of: failure to keep legible medical records that justify the course of treatment and committing medical malpractice by failing to meet the standard of care. The following penalties were imposed: a reprimand, an administrative fine of $35,000, a requirement to complete Board-approved laws and rules course and medical records course, a prohibition on prescribing certain controlled substances for the treatment of chronic non-malignant pain, and a prohibition against owning, operating or being employed by a pain management clinic. The College was notified of this finding by a report received on March 13, 2018.