skip to content

Abrahamse, Cornelis Jan

CPSO#: 30996

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
979 Pinehill Rd
Selwyn ON  K9J 6X2
Phone: (705) 808-1983 Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CORNELIS JAN ABRAHAMSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAMSE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1983
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.