skip to content

Abraham, Natalia

CPSO#: 94949

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Agency of Canada
130 Colonnade Rd
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: 1-844-280-5020 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:15 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATALIA ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 05 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 10 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2020 to 15 May 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2020