skip to content

Abourbih, Jacques

CPSO#: 29692

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 31 Dec 1977
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1978 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015