skip to content

Abounaja, Mohamed Asadig

CPSO#: 89997

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone: (416) 690-3533
Fax: 888-630-9203 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge health. Ajax
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge health. Ajax
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

105-1939 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough Chronic Pain and Migrai
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Canada
Phone: 416-412-0505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100-111 Simcoe St N
Oshawa Chronic Pain and Migraine Cl
Oshawa ON  L1G 4S4
Canada
Phone: 289-316-1645
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abounaja ( CPSO# 89997 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Corporation Name: Alazhari Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2018
Corporation Name: Dr. M. Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Apr 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 13 Apr 2021 Active
 As from April 13, 2021, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed Asadig Abounaja in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Abounaja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")
of
DR. MOHAMED ASADIG ABOUNAJA
("Dr. Abounaja")
to 
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE
(1)	In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
(2)	I, Dr. Abounaja, certificate of registration number 89997, am a member of the College.  
(3)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that pursuant to an undertaking that I signed on August 14, 2019 (the "August 2019 Undertaking"), I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my record keeping and standard of practice in emergency medicine.
(4)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that this Undertaking, as signed by me, replaces the August 2019 Undertaking, and the August 2019 Undertaking is no longer in effect.
(5)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that at the time I sign this Undertaking, I work in the emergency departments of the following two hospitals: Scarborough Health Network and Lakeridge Health - Ajax Pickering Hospital.
B.	UNDERTAKING
(6)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(7)	Practice Restriction
(a)	I, Dr. Abounaja, will ensure that my final note for each patient encounter in the emergency department is typewritten.
(8)	Clinical Supervision 
(a)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
(b)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B";
(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;
(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;
(iv)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting, including at least one (1) patient presenting with each of the following, if seen by me in the previous month: shortness of breath, head injury, and spinal injury;
(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews, including my compliance with respect to all of my final notes being typewritten;
(vi)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 
(vii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and
(viii)	Submit written reports to the College at least once every month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
(c)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the presentations set out in section (7)(b)(iv), any other areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated October 14, 2020, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
(d)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
(e)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
(f)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.
(g)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising emergency medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
(h)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.
(9)	Reports from the Department Chiefs
(a)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to ensure that the Chiefs of the Emergency Departments provide reports to the College in accordance with the undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "C". I have reviewed this undertaking and understand what is required of the Chiefs of the Emergency Departments, which includes, without limiting the generality of the foregoing: 
(i)	Written reports to the College every three (3) months; 
(ii)	Such reports to include information regarding my compliance in ensuring my encounter notes are typewritten; 
(iii)	Immediate reports to the College if he or she has any concerns about my record keeping, including that I am not in compliance with my Undertaking.
(b)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to ensure that Appendix "C" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date that I execute this Undertaking. 
(c)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that if any person who has given an undertaking in the form attached as Appendix "C" to this undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time. 
(10)	Professional Education  
(a)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
(i)	Documentation: Principles of Medical Record Keeping eLearning Module;
(ii)	Review, reflection, and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of the following:            
1.	Medical Records Documentation, College Policy; and
(iii)	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.
(b)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months of the date I sign this Undertaking.
(d)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(11)	Reassessment of Practice
(a)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (7) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (9) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review of a minimum of twenty-five (25) charts, and may include: direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
(b)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
(c)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
(d)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
(12)	Monitoring 
(a)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(b)	I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(c)	I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(d)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form attached hereto as Appendix "D". 
C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(13)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(14)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(15)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(16)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").
(17)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.
(18)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
(19)	Public Register
(a)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b)	I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Pursuant to an Undertaking signed on August 14, 2019, Dr. Abounaja underwent remediation and a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment raised concerns about Dr. Abounaja's medical record keeping and standard of practice in emergency medicine. As a result of the reassessment:
Dr. Abounaja shall ensure his final note for each patient encounter is typewritten.
Dr. Abounaja shall ensure the College receives quarterly reports from his Department Chiefs regarding his record keeping.

Dr. Abounaja will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months. 
Dr. Abounaja will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.
Dr. Abounaja's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and Professional Education.
D.	CONSENT
(20)	I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:
(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 
(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(21)	I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(22)	I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
(c)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Chief of Emergency Department's undertaking set out at Appendix "C" to this Undertaking;
(d)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;
(e)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
(f)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 13, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohamed Asadig Abounaja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 13, 2021:

Pursuant to an Undertaking signed on August 14, 2019, Dr. Abounaja underwent remediation and a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment raised concerns about Dr. Abounaja’s medical record keeping and standard of practice in emergency medicine. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Abounaja shall ensure his final note for each patient encounter is typewritten.

Dr. Abounaja shall ensure the College receives quarterly reports from his Department Chiefs regarding his record keeping.

Dr. Abounaja will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Abounaja will engage in professional education in medical record keeping.

Dr. Abounaja’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and Professional Education.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 16, 2020, Dr. Abounaja has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)