skip to content

Abootalebi, Shahram

CPSO#: 96544

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2011 to 22 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2013