skip to content

Abonowara, Abdulgani Ab M

CPSO#: 97498

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
282 Linwell Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Phone: (905) 646-5557
Fax: (905) 646-5559 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abonowara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abonowara ( CPSO# 97498 )

Business Address:
204 - 282 Linwell Road
St Catharines ON  L2N 6N5
Phone Number: (905) 646-5557


Corporation Name: Elkout Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abonowara ( CPSO# 97498 )
Dr. L. Elkout ( CPSO# 97507 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
136 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 306-0097

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABDULGANI AB M ABONOWARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABONOWARA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2012