skip to content

Abo-El Ella, Shaimaa Mustafa Morsi

CPSO#: 88735

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles ST
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-4600 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Charles St
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: 613-345-4600
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shaimaa Abo-El Ella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abo-El Ella ( CPSO# 88735 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAIMAA MUSTAFA MORSI ABO-EL ELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABO-EL ELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 12 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2011 to 12 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2012 to 12 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2014