skip to content

Abidi, Rabbiya Nasir

CPSO#: 89843

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16045 1st Ave S
1st floor
Burien WA  98148

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rabbiya Nasir Abidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 23 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia
USA - Florida
USA - Virginia
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RABBIYA NASIR ABIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABIDI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009