skip to content

Abhayambika, Archana

CPSO#: 86525

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Kerala, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 24 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010