skip to content

Abelsohn, Alan Ralph

CPSO#: 29948

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Jun 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 483-8111
Fax: (416) 483-8182 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Abelsohn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abelsohn ( CPSO# 29948 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 483-8111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Dec 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2009 Active
             As from October 14, 2009, at 11:59 p.m., by order of the Discipline Committee
            of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the terms, conditions and
            limitations imposed on October 15, 2004 on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Alan Ralph Abelsohn are varied and the following terms, conditions and
            limitations are imposed:  

                  (a)    Dr. Abelsohn is to continue to report all K005 billings to the
                        College, and commence reporting any K007 billings to the College on
                        a monthly basis. With respect to billing codes K005 and K007, Dr.
                        Abelsohn shall maintain a separate log by patient name of all
                        services billed under these Codes, to be submitted to the College
                        within five days of the end of each month. Dr. Abelsohn may provide
                        family or marital therapy to patients, but may only provide such
                        treatment in the presence of two or more family members or
                        individuals;
                  
                  (b)   Dr. Abelsohn is to continue to co-operate with any medical
                        inspector that the College wishes to send who may conduct random
                        inspections of Dr. Abelsohn's OHIP billings and their supporting
                        clinical record entries for specified codes and periods subsequent
                        to the date of this Order of the inspector's choosing; 
                  
                  (c)   Dr. Abelsohn will forthwith execute a consent in the form attached
                        at Schedule "A" consenting to the release of his OHIP billing
                        information to the College;
                  
                  (d)   Dr. Abelsohn is to obtain a practice monitor acceptable to the
                        College to review any charts relating to individual psychotherapy
                        including, but not limited to, any patients for whom K007 code has
                        been billed, for a period of two years; and
                  
                  (e)   with respect to billing code K007, the maximum number of patient
                        visits that Dr. Abelsohn may have with any one patient is limited
                        to four and the maximum number of visits  per week for each patient
                        is one. Dr. Abelsohn may bill 2 unit sessions (totaling 46 minutes)
                        per patient, per week as long as the units are consecutive and the
                        maximum number of visits per week does not exceed one.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Aug 2004
Summary:

On August 3, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Abelsohn committed acts of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient (touching and behaviour of a sexual nature), engaged in acts relevant to the practise of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional (various boundary violations). In addition, the Committee found Dr. Abelsohn to be incompetent as defined in subsection 52(1) of the Code.

On October 14, 2004, the Discipline Committee ordered the following:
1. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Abelsohn s certificate of registration for a period of twelve (12) months, to commence on December 1, 2004.

2. The Discipline Committee directs that the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Abelsohn s certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time:
(a) Dr. Abelsohn must successfully complete a boundaries course acceptable to the College at his own expense before November 1, 2005;

(b) Dr. Abelsohn is prohibited from providing individual psychotherapy to patients, and from providing or billing for any service which should be billed under the OHIP codes applicable to individual psychotherapy, including K006 and K007. With respect to billing code K005, Dr. Abelsohn shall maintain a separate log by patient name of all services billed under Code K005, to be submitted to the Registrar within five days of the end of each month. Dr. Abelsohn may provide family or marital therapy to patients, but may only provide such treatment in the presence of two or more family members or individuals;

(c) Dr. Abelsohn will forthwith execute a consent in the form attached at Schedule A consenting to the release of his OHIP billing information to the College; and

(d) Dr. Abelsohn will co-operate with any medical inspector chosen by the College who may conduct random inspections of Dr. Abelsohn's OHIP billings and their supporting chart entries for specified codes and periods subsequent to the date of this Order of the inspector's choosing.

3. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Abelsohn to attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.

4. The Discipline Committee further orders that this proceeding be included in the Register.
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Dec 01, 2003