skip to content

Abells, Dara Naomi

CPSO#: 100187

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Eglinton Ave. West
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: 416-782-6111
Fax: 416-782-5515 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

5734 Yonge Street, Suite 500
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Canada
Phone: 416-224-5959
Fax: 416-224-2772
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DARA NAOMI ABELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABELLS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015