skip to content

Abedi, Syed Morteza

CPSO#: 96214

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: 905 576 8711 Ext. 34114 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dynacare Laboratories
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5V1
Canada
Phone: 905 790 3000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.M. Abedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abedi ( CPSO# 96214 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5V1
Phone Number: (905) 790-3000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 03 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYED MORTEZA ABEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2017