skip to content

Abdurrahman, Murtala Bamdele

CPSO#: 25841

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Nov 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hausa, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary Hospital
Scarborough bHealth Network
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7013
Fax: (416) 281-7102 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.B. Abdurrahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdurrahman ( CPSO# 25841 )

Business Address:
722 - 115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone Number: (416) 743-6063

Business Address:
38 Church Street
Durham ON  L1S 6E3

Business Address:
Suite 202
2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 665-8515

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MURTALA BAMDELE ABDURRAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDURRAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Nov 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1992