skip to content

Abdullah, Rukhsana Asif

CPSO#: 92285

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Hospital, THP
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7580 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 4A
128 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 997-7738
Fax: (905) 997-7714
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. A. Abdullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdullah ( CPSO# 92285 )

Business Address:
4A - 128 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Phone Number: (905) 997-7712

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:09 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUKHSANA ASIF ABDULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010