skip to content

Abdulla, Ramzan Hussein

CPSO#: 28056

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Feb 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Abdullah, Ramzan Hussein (used until: 09 Jan 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Makerere Univ, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020