skip to content

Abdulhussein, Rahim

CPSO#: 90762

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Unit 501
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-5665
Fax: (416) 438-4554 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rahim Abdulhussein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdulhussein ( CPSO# 90762 )

Business Address:
Building B
Unit 3307
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 438-5665

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAHIM ABDULHUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULHUSSEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011