Abdul Hadi, Deema Sameer Omar (CPSO#: 90479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mi Clinic
Unit A005 A006
2690 Erin Centre Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5M5P5
Phone: (905) 607 1700
Fax: (905) 607-1702
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 5-521 Hamilton Regional Hwy 8
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1G4
Canada
Phone: 905 662 2777
Fax: 905 662 7775
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deema Abdul Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Abdul Hadi ( CPSO# 90479 )

Business Address:
521 Hamilton Regional Highway 8
Unit 5
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1G4
Phone Number: (905) 662-2777

Business Address:
Units A005 A006
2690 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5P5
Phone Number: (905) 607-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEMA SAMEER OMAR ABDUL HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDUL HADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011