skip to content

Abdelshaheed, Tamer

CPSO#: 90761

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Specialty Clinic
3865 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Suite 106
Vaughan ON  L4H 4P4
Phone: 9054179600
Fax: 9055533733 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 trench street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 9058831212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tamer Abdelshaheed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Abdelshaheed ( CPSO# 90761 )

Business Address:
106 - 3865 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L4H 4P4
Phone Number: (905) 417-9600

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:21 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAMER ABDELSHAHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELSHAHEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013