skip to content

Abdelhussein, Hussein Sabah

CPSO#: 97804

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2A
164 Colborne street west
Brantford ON  N3T 1L2
Phone: 519-304-9200
Fax: 5193049201 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Abdelhussein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abdelhussein ( CPSO# 97804 )

Business Address:
Unit 2A
164 Colborne Street West
Brantford ON  N3T 1L2
Phone Number: (519) 304-9200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUSSEIN SABAH ABDELHUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELHUSSEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012