skip to content

Abdelhalim, Vanessa

CPSO#: 95806

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bradford West Gwillimbury
Family Health Centre
100 Holland Court
Bradford ON  L3Z 1R8
Phone: (905) 775-8782
Fax: (905) 775-9290 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Medispa Orleans
2211 St. Joseph Blvd.
Orléans ON  K1C 7C5
Canada
Phone: 6138340333
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Bank Street Ottawa Medispa
1379 Bank St
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N3
Canada
Phone: 6137335500
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Derma Lounge
38 Wellington St E Unit 2A
Aurora ON  L4G 1H5
Canada
Phone: (905) 503-4343
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Aura Laser and Skin Care Clinic
5985 Steeles Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1V 5P7
Canada
Phone: (416) 412-2872 Ext. 4164122872
Fax: (416) 412-2872
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

V Botanique
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 5W9
Canada
Phone: 905-604-1152
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

King Skin Clinic
11 Ria Court
King City ON  L7B 0N4
Canada
Phone: 6479838632
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Abdelhalim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Abdelhalim ( CPSO# 95806 )

Business Address:
100 Holland Court
Bradford ON  L3Z 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 775-8782

Business Address:
2211 St Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 7C5
Phone Number: (613) 834-0333

Business Address:
1379 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N3
Phone Number: (613) 733-5500

Business Address:
38 Wellington Street East
Suite 2A
Aurora ON  L4G 1H5
Phone Number: (416) 710-8438

Business Address:
1 - 5985 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 5P7
Phone Number: (416) 412-2872

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VANESSA ABDELHALIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELHALIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013