skip to content

Abdelhalim, Tarek

CPSO#: 95682

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street, Toronto, ON
M5T 2S8
GIM - 8th Floor- East Wing - 8E 407
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Phone: 416-340-4800
Fax: 416-352-5611 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York - Ontario
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: 416-352-5611
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tarek Abdelhalim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Abdelhalim ( CPSO# 95682 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of General Internal Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 756-6002

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
8 East
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (647) 802-6243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAREK ABDELHALIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELHALIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015