skip to content

Abdelgadir, Dalal Yosif Ahmed

CPSO#: 87200

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Royal Alexandra Hospital, Northern Alberta Neonatal Program, DTC 5027, 10240 Kingsway Avenue, Edmonton, AB, T5H 3V9
Date Received: 08 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2016