skip to content

Abdel-Shahid, Raafat Barsoum

CPSO#: 29368

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 4-Oct-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 3845 Borrelli Drive Windsor ON N9G 2H7 Tel: 519-972-1050 Fax: 519-972-1050
Date Received: 19 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:29 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Dec 2014