skip to content

Abdel-Qadir, Husam-Eldin Mohamed

CPSO#: 86702

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Cardiology Clinic
4th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7723
Fax: (416) 323-6304 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Downsview Cardiology
6-906 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 2T5
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-0045
Fax: (416) 633-0048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

190 Elizabeth St.
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

181 Bay Street
Suite 3000
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H.M. Abdel-Qadir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abdel-Qadir ( CPSO# 86702 )

Business Address:
906 Sheppard Avenue West
Unit 6
Toronto ON  M3H 2T5

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Suite 310
Toronto ON  M5S 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5C2
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUSAM-ELDIN MOHAMED ABDEL-QADIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-QADIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011