skip to content

Abdel-Malek, Nada

CPSO#: 93539

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital Apotex LTC
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 7852500 Ext. 2879
Fax: (416) 785-4221 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
Palliative Care Unit (1 Centre)
381 Church Street, PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 9054727373
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nada Abdel-Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdel-Malek ( CPSO# 93539 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (907) 472-7373

Business Address:
Baycrest Centre
Apotex 6th Floor
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADA ABDEL-MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012