skip to content

Abdel Malek, Mira Girgis Kamel

CPSO#: 90238

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1119
2670 County Road 43
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-4131
Fax: (613) 258-2799 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abdel Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 90238 )

Business Address:
2670 County Road 43
PO Box 1119
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-4131


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Mar 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIRA GIRGIS KAMEL ABDEL MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 24 May 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2011