skip to content

Abdel Hadi, Farid Mostafa

CPSO#: 85555

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1006
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone: (905) 245-0711
Fax: (905) 245-0522 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
The Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Court
Durham ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

IVF Canada
Suite 304
2347 Kennedy Street
Toronto ON  M1T 3T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 754-1010
Fax: (416) 321-1239
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

50 Absolute Ave
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-0772
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

80 Glen Shields Ave #5
Concord ON  L4K 1T7
Canada
Phone: (905) 669-0306
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

9080 Yonge Street
Level 2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2 Champagne Drive: East Entrance
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2
Canada
Phone: 416-222-6160
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

108-7100 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 5J2
Canada
Phone: 9056047976
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 1N8
Canada
Phone: 905- 864-0000
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

324 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 1A6
Canada
Phone: 416-918-7989
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1-4450 Highway 7 E
Unionville ON  L3R 1M2
Canada
Phone: 905-245-0711
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

9390 Woodbine Ave
King Square Medical center
Markham ON  L6C 0M5
Canada
Phone: 9057664700
Fax: 9056700767
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abdel Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Abdel Hadi ( CPSO# 85555 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
304 - 2347 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T8
Phone Number: (416) 754-1010

Business Address:
7191 Yonge Street
Suite 1006
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4

Business Address:
Suite 108
7100 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 5J2

Business Address:
7095 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2

Business Address:
50 Absolute Avenue
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0B8

Business Address:
238 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 1N8

Business Address:
80 Glen Shields Avenue
Suite 5
Concord ON  L4K 1T7

Business Address:
Unit 12
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7

Business Address:
Unit 12
80 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2N 2H4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARID MOSTAFA ABDEL HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL HADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 11 Sep 2006 to 06 Nov 2006
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 07 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2021

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 10, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)