skip to content

Abdalla, Mohamed Ali Abdulrehman

CPSO#: 88196

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Swahili

Education:University of Nairobi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg District Memorial
Hospital
Department of Medicine
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611 Ext. 5232
Fax: (519) 842-7008 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohamed A. A. Abdalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdalla ( CPSO# 88196 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial
Hospital
Department of Medicine
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013 Active
             Dr.  Mohamed  Ali  Abdulrehman  Abdalla  may practise medicine independently in
            Internal Medicine, only.