skip to content

Abbey, Bruce Verne

CPSO#: 24716

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Jul 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
21 College Avenue West
Guelph ON  N1G 1R7
Phone: (519) 654-2200
Fax: (519) 654-9105 Electoral District: 03

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 24 Jul 2019 Active
 
            As from July 24, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Bruce Verne Abbey,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Abbey to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                         DR. BRUCE VERNE ABBEY
                                             ("Dr. Abbey")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Abbey, certificate of registration number 24716, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Abbey, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 1101460 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct or am incompetent in my practice, including my
                  Infection Prevention and Control practices.

            (4)   I, Dr. Abbey, acknowledge that I am also the subject of a Section 13
                  Order made by the Wellington-Dufferin-Guelph Public Health Unit ("Public
                  Health") dated June 28, 2019, prohibiting me from reprocessing reusable
                  medical equipment until approved to resume doing so by Public Health. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT

            (5)   I, Dr. Abbey, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date the undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  (the "Effective Date"). 

            (6)   I, Dr. Abbey, hereby resign from the College effective October 10, 2019
                  (the "Resignation Date"). 

            (7)   I, Dr. Abbey, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration
                  as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction
                  after the Resignation Date.

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abbey, undertake to restrict my practice as follows until
                        the Resignation Date:
                  
                        (i)   I will restrict my practice to consultations in skin
                              disorders and the following procedures only: Liquid nitrogen
                              treatments and phototherapy treatments.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Abbey, acknowledge that in the event that the College should
                  become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking including, but not
                  limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied, re-applied or
                  attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a
                  certificate of registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in any
                  jurisdiction after the Resignation Date, the College shall, in its sole
                  discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on
                  the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to
                  proceed with the Investigation it terminated as a result of this
                  Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (10)  I, Dr. Abbey, hereby agree to bear the risk of any prejudice that the
                  passage of time might cause to my ability to make full answer and
                  defence, and waive the right to seek any remedy on the basis of the
                  passage of time, should the College proceed with any allegations that may
                  arise as a result of a breach of this Undertaking and/or pursuant to
                  section (9) above.

            (11)  I, Dr. Abbey, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". 

            (12)  I, Dr. Abbey, undertake that upon approval of this Undertaking by the ICR
                  Committee, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that
                  my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the
                  Resignation Date.

            (13)  I, Dr. Abbey, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Abbey, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., if
                  any, arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Abbey, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Abbey, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Abbey, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Abbey, consent to this Undertaking being posted on the
                        Public Register.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Abbey, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Abbey
                              engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his
                              practice, including his Infection Prevention and Control
                              practice. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Abbey has
                              agreed to resign from the College, effective October 10,
                              2019, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for
                              registration as a physician in Ontario or any other
                              jurisdiction.
                  
                              Until the date of his resignation, Dr. Abbey will restrict
                              his practice to consultations in skin disorders and the
                              following procedures only: Liquid nitrogen treatments and
                              phototherapy treatments. 

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 24, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bruce Verne Abbey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 24, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Abbey engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent in his practice, including his Infection Prevention and Control practice. In the face of the investigation, Dr. Abbey has agreed to resign from the College, effective October 10, 2019, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Until the date of his resignation, Dr. Abbey will restrict his practice to consultations in skin disorders and the following procedures only: Liquid nitrogen treatments and phototherapy treatments.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)