skip to content

Abbas, Wasan Abdul Ameer Abdul

CPSO#: 93496

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 105
206 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone: (905) 777-1111
Fax: (905) 777-1118 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wasan Abbas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abbas ( CPSO# 93496 )

Business Address:
206 James Street South
Suite 105
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone Number: (905) 777-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WASAN ABDUL AMEER ABDUL ABBAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2013