skip to content

Abbas, Harith Abdulkhither

CPSO#: 90802

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Phone: 905-277-4000
Fax: 905-277-4012 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Harith Abbas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2017
Corporation Name: Dr. Harith Abbas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abbas ( CPSO# 90802 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Center
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Department of Surgery
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Phone Number: (905) 306-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARITH ABDULKHITHER ABBAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012