skip to content

Abba, Zaheera

CPSO#: 85522

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Anver Kalla, Zaheera (used until: 07 Sep 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Family Physicians
Suite 203
9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E6
Phone: (905) 889-7997
Fax: 905-889-2666 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zaheera Abba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Abba ( CPSO# 85522 )

Business Address:
Bayview Family Physicians
203 - 9160 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E9
Phone Number: (905) 889-7997


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZAHEERA ABBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006