skip to content

Abaiian, Kayvan Jasper

CPSO#: 89951

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 06 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008