skip to content

Jiwa, Aalim Shaukat

CPSO#: 112248

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Bloor St West, Suite 1202
Toronto ON  M5S 2V6
Phone: (416) 921-4587
Fax: 4169214632 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aalim Jiwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jiwa ( CPSO# 112248)

Business Address:
180 Bloor Street West
Suite 1202
Toronto ON  M5S 2V6
Phone Number: (604) 786-7427


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AALIM SHAUKAT JIWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019